THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 3:34:25 AM
Blinkina, Anna Alexandrovna
CPSO#:
87651
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 May 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 May 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Russian
Education: I.M. Sechenov Moscow Medical Academy, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON K5H 5S5
Phone: (613) 938-4240
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cornwall Community Hospital |
Cornwall |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:31 Aug 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANNA ALEXANDROVNA BLINKINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLINKINA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2007 to 26 Nov 2007
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 27 Nov 2007 to 03 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 03 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 04 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 13 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 28 Aug 2023 to 19 Nov 2023
CF - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Nov 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Mar 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 May 2011 |