THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:39:16 AM
Ng, Karen Agatha
CPSO#:
87646
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jan 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 475
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 8563
Fax: (416) 586-5113
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Dec 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:31 Dec 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KAREN AGATHA NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
EL - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 2011 |