THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 10:13:47 AM
Shaikh, Omer Sharif
CPSO#:
87635
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Aug 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
24 Aug 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Karachi, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Rainbow Pediatrics
204 - 589 Lake Street
St Catharines ON L2N 7L6
Phone: (905) 646-5437
Fax: (905) 646-5438
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:24 Aug 2007 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Aug 2007 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 23 Feb 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Dec 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 May 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jun 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jun 2009 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jun 2009 |
|
Active |