THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 10:59:40 AM
Rodriguez, Jennifer Mandado
CPSO#:
87634
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Oct 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Cebuano, English, Filipino
Education: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Med, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Santos Rodriguez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 16 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:08 May 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Aug 2007 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 23 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Oct 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Oct 2008 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |