THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 16:36:51 PM
Murray, Cathy Maureen
CPSO#:
87615
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jul 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:27 Sep 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 27 Aug 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
EL - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Sep 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |