THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:48:54 AM
Gonzalez Pupo, Rafael Angel
CPSO#:
87587
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Inst.Sup.Ciencias de Med.de Stgo.de Cuba, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1400 NW 12Th Ave
Suite 1
Miami FL 33136-1087
United States
Phone: 3056892784
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAFAEL ANGEL GONZALEZ PUPO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GONZALEZ PUPO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2007 to 21 Oct 2007
PEAP - CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 22 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 17 Nov 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
AVP - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 10 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 11 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Vascular Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |