THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/12/23 0:47:41 AM
Akhtari, Shahrzad
CPSO#:
87559
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Sep 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Sep 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Shaheed Sadooghi University, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Alvand Medical Centre
Unit C 20 & C21
50 Dr Kay Dr
Schomberg ON L0G 1T0
Phone: 905-939-9111
Fax: 905-884-6100
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:31 Aug 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHAHRZAD AKHTARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKHTARI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2007 to 26 Nov 2007
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 27 Nov 2007 to 03 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2008 to 03 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Nov 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Sep 2009 |