THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:41:21 AM
Idais, Iyad Mohammed Abed El Hameed
CPSO#:
87531
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jan 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Oct 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Baskirian State Medical University, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2007 to 23 Oct 2007
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2008 to 30 Jan 2009
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Oct 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jan 2009 |