skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/09/21 2:47:09 AM

Redpath, Calum Jon

CPSO#: 87517

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Jan 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 27 Jan 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Heart Inst
Department of Electrophysiology
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696 7000 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Calum Redpath Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Redpath ( CPSO# 87500 )
Dr. C. Redpath ( CPSO# 87517 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Heart Institution
Department of Electrophysiology
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 696-7271


Corporation Name: Stephanie Redpath Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Redpath ( CPSO# 87500 )
Dr. C. Redpath ( CPSO# 87517 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Division of Neonatology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective:27 Jan 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2007 to 29 Aug 2007
PEAP - CF - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
CF - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2008 to 30 Aug 2008
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Oct 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 27 Oct 2016 Active
             Dr. Calum Jon Redpath may practise medicine independently in cardiology.