THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 10:02:26 AM
Dahche, Tarek
CPSO#:
87506
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Aug 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Aug 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: National University of Ireland, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
825 Coxwell Av.
Toronto
Toronto ON M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 461-8272
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:05 May 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TAREK DAHCHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAHCHE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 03 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Sep 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 2009 |