THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 4:23:03 AM
Frenklah, Yuri
CPSO#:
87457
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Oct 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Oct 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Melbourne Faculty of Medic, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 207
840 Coxwell Avenue
East York ON M4C 5T2
Phone: (416) 463-1864
Fax: (647) 933-1151
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:12 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. YURI FRENKLAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRENKLAH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Jul 2007 to 01 Oct 2007
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 02 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 12 Feb 2009
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Feb 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 2009 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Jan 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Oct 2013 |