THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 22:27:49 PM
Nguyen, Geoffrey Christopher
CPSO#:
87454
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Apr 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Apr 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: The Johns Hopkins University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 437
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 2819
Fax: (416) 586-5971
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 May 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:20 Oct 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GEOFFREY CHRISTOPHER NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Aug 2007 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 15 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Apr 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Apr 2008 |