THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 5:02:53 AM
Montiveros, Carolina
CPSO#:
87445
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: National University of Cordoba, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Jenny Trout Centre
Suite 113
342 Erie Street
Stratford ON N5A 2N4
Phone: (519) 272-2040
Fax: (519) 272-2323
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
South Huron Hospital Association |
Exeter |
Stratford General Hospital |
Stratford |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CAROLINA MONTIVEROS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONTIVEROS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
AVP - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2010
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2010 |