skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 27/11/21 23:57:01 PM

Sohal, Barjinder Singh

CPSO#: 87410

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Max Rady College of Medicine, University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
B-6 Harvey St
Chatham ON  N7M 1L6
Phone: 8889306571
Fax: 8559672945 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Barjinder Singh Sohal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Sohal ( CPSO# 87410 )

Business Address:
3rd Floor
799 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6G 1L8
Phone Number: (647) 349-0053

Business Address:
1000 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5S 3A8
Phone Number: (416) 915-9285


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BARJINDER SINGH SOHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOHAL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2007

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: January 27, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)