THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
31/03/23 16:04:20 PM
Sedarat, Franklin
CPSO#:
87409
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
25 Sep 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Jul 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences Sc, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2004 to 31 Oct 2004
Research Fellows - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Jul 2007 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 08 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Sep 2007 |