THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/12/23 14:42:51 PM
Borger, Jonathan Ronald
CPSO#:
87403
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Oct 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Manitoba, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Campus Site
Department of Anaesthesia
P O Box 5339
339 Windermere Road B3 218
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance |
Chatham |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound |
Owen Sound |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site |
London |
St Joseph Health Care,London- Mental Health |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care - St Joseph's Site London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JONATHAN RONALD BORGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORGER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 08 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 09 Jul 2008 to 08 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 09 Jul 2009 to 08 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 09 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2011 |