THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 13:57:53 PM
Shah, Chintankumar Champaklal
CPSO#:
87401
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi
Education: B. J. Medical College, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 11 & 12
965 Bovaird Dr West
Brampton ON L6X 5K7
Phone: (905) 497-7779
Fax: (905) 497-7707
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHINTANKUMAR CHAMPAKLAL SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
AVP - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 05 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 06 Jul 2008 to 05 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 06 Jul 2009 to 05 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology
McMaster University, 06 Jul 2010 to 05 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology
McMaster University, 06 Jul 2011 to 05 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology
McMaster University, 06 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jul 2013 |