skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 01/12/21 20:15:07 PM

Bajaj, Girish

CPSO#: 87397

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Delhi, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
18 Kensington Rd
Suite 105
Brampton ON  L6T 4S5
Phone: (905) 497 2007
Fax: (905) 840 0999 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: 4165864727
Fax: 4165864802
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Brampton Endoscopy Centre
10886 Hurontorio Street
Suite A 7
Brampton ON  L7A3R9
Canada
Phone: 9054955200
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Girish Bajaj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Bajaj ( CPSO# 87397 )

Business Address:
Brampton Endoscopy Centre
Suite A7
10886 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L7A 3R9
Phone Number: (905) 495-5200

Business Address:
207-10 Cottrelle Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6S 0E2
Phone Number: (905) 794-4497

Business Address:
105-18 Kensington Road
Brampton ON  L6T 4S5
Phone Number: (905) 497-2007

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4727


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital General Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:07 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:29 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GIRISH BAJAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAJAJ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2008