THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/09/23 4:52:39 AM
Maheshwari, Ekta
CPSO#:
87396
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
31 Dec 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Feb 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Jiwaji University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Ekta Maheshwari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 25 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 10 Sep 2007
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 11 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jan 2010
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Dec 2013 |