THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:23:31 AM
Isaac, Rajakumar Kylath
CPSO#:
87375
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dr. N.T.R University of Health Sciences, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
500 Water St
Miramichi NB E1V 3G5
Phone: 9028724477
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 05 Jul 2007 to 15 Aug 2007
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 16 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2011 to 31 Mar 2012
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Aug 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |