THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 22:21:02 PM
Mulgund, Manisha Milind
CPSO#:
87372
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi, Kachchi, Marathi
Education: University of Mumbai, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
120 San Antonio Drive
Unit 3
Hamilton ON L9C 5N2
Phone: (905) 574-9999
Fax: (905) 574-8799
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:27 Sep 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MANISHA MILIND MULGUND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULGUND is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
AVP - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 04 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 05 Jul 2008 to 04 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 05 Jul 2009 to 04 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
McMaster University, 05 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2010 |