THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:23:14 AM
Berman, Hal Kenneth
CPSO#:
87365
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Mar 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
25 Mar 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Univ of Texas Southwestern Med School, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Pathology
11th Floor Eaton Wing, 11E230
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4607
Fax: (416) 340-5517
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Laboratory Medicine |
Effective:25 Mar 2013 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Mar 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Mar 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Mar 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Nov 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 06 Nov 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Nov 2013 |
|
Active |