THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 16:02:02 PM
Proulx, Genevieve Christiane
CPSO#:
87361
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Sep 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Sep 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Méde, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4170 Ch Sainte-Angélique
Saint-Lazare QC J7T 2N5
Phone: 613-878-5231
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GENEVIEVE CHRISTIANE PROULX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PROULX is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Sep 2012 |