THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 11:20:36 AM
Glassman, Steven Jeremy
CPSO#:
87346
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Feb 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
05 Feb 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Afrikaans, English
Education: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Dermatology Clinic
4th Floor Civic Parkdale Clinic
737 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Y 1J8
Phone: (613) 761-4689
Fax: (613) 761-4087
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bruyere Continuing Care |
Ottawa |
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site |
Ottawa |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:05 Feb 2008 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Jul 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Dec 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Dec 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Apr 2015 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 09 Apr 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Apr 2015 |
|
Active |