THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 10:21:38 AM
Sheolal, Ravitha
CPSO#:
87323
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Sep 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Sep 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Natal, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia & Perioper
Western University
Schulich School of Medicine
339 Windermere Road
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: 519-685-8600 Ext. 33270
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Missouri
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:29 May 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAVITHA SHEOLAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEOLAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 21 Sep 2007
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 22 Sep 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Apr 2008 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 14 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Dec 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2010 |