THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:22:50 AM
Lalonde, Katelyn Emily
CPSO#:
87313
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jul 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Nickerson, Katelyn Emily (used until: 15 Dec 2015 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Arbour Family Medicine
Suite 201
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 680-1065
Fax: (613) 695-1870
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Jul 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KATELYN EMILY LALONDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LALONDE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 27 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 2009 |