THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/09/23 0:53:48 AM
Pena Fernandez, Elena
CPSO#:
87311
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jan 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jan 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: University of Madrid, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Medical Imaging
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 722 7000 Ext. 10995
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Almonte General Hospital |
Almonte |
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital |
Arnprior |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,General Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Renfrew Victoria Hospital |
Renfrew |
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute |
Ottawa |
Winchester District Memorial Hospital |
Winchester |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:01 Jan 2012 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 05 Jul 2007 to 04 Aug 2007
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 05 Aug 2007 to 30 May 2008
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 08 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 May 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Mar 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 May 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Jan 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Aug 2017 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Aug 2017 |
|
Active |