skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/07/21 15:08:01 PM

Heshka, Jodi Taryn

CPSO#: 87309

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Dec 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Cardiovascular Centre
Suite 502
1355 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Phone: (613) 738-1584 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. J. Heshka Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Heshka ( CPSO# 87309 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Cardiovascular Centre
502 - 1355 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Phone Number: (613) 738-1584

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:20 Dec 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JODI TARYN HESHKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HESHKA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 20 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Dec 2010 to 19 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2011