THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/09/23 23:40:43 PM
Wilson, Jefferson Roy
CPSO#:
87268
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jul 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
30 Bond Street Room 3-074
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. J. Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 27 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JEFFERSON ROY WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jul 2016 |