THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 6:28:58 AM
Nadeem, Syed Muhammad Najaf Ali
CPSO#:
87241
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Sep 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Sep 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1235 Wilson Ave
North York ON M3M 0B2
Phone: 416-242-1000 Ext. 47161
Fax: 416-264-5645
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nova Scotia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:10 May 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:18 Oct 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SYED MUHAMMAD NAJAF ALI NADEEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NADEEM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Sep 2018 |