THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 1:53:40 AM
Amaladoss, Alfred Michael Manickam
CPSO#:
87221
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Sep 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Sep 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Stellenbosch, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
450 Bronte St S
Milton ON L9T 8T2
Phone: 905 636 0366
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Aug 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALFRED MICHAEL MANICKAM AMALADOSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMALADOSS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Aug 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Sep 2012 |