THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 1:50:32 AM
Vasudev, Pooja
CPSO#:
87216
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Delhi, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pathology
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton Avenue East
Room L222-5
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 34249
Fax: 9055216192
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. POOJA VASUDEV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VASUDEV is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
AVP - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Oct 2008 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |