THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 21:37:38 PM
AlObaidi, Rashid Abdulaziz R
CPSO#:
87207
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
27 Jul 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Mar 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:McMaster Children Hospital
3E20
1280 Main St W
Hamilton, ON L8S 4K1
Date Received: 27 Jul 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:01 Aug 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:26 Sep 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 01 Aug 2007
PEAP - R - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 02 Aug 2007 to 01 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 02 Aug 2008 to 01 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 02 Aug 2009 to 01 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 02 Aug 2010 to 01 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Aug 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Mar 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 27 Jul 2018 |