skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/07/21 23:45:02 PM

Ritchie, Laura Catherine

CPSO#: 87185

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 May 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 May 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Operating Room (Cardiac Surgery)
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 46277 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Laura C. Ritchie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Ritchie ( CPSO# 87185 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
Operating Room-Cardiac Surgery
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Apr 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LAURA CATHERINE RITCHIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RITCHIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2008 to 30 Apr 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 May 2009 to 30 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 2010