THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 8:22:31 AM
Helmi, Sanaa Talat Helmi Ahmed
CPSO#:
87164
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Sep 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Sep 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
42 Monaco Crt
Brampton ON L7A 1X4
Phone: 9058674440
Fax: 8334401357
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt
USA - Alabama
USA - Connecticut
USA - Kansas
USA - Pennsylvania
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:04 May 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SANAA TALAT HELMI AHMED HELMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HELMI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Sep 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 2010 |