skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 03/12/21 20:55:40 PM

Samaan, Zainab Amer

CPSO#: 87157

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Mar 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 16 Mar 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah College o, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
West 5th Campus
100 West 5th St
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Drs. C & Z Samaan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Samaan ( CPSO# 86622 )
Dr. Z. Samaan ( CPSO# 87157 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Centre for Mountain Health Services
Mood Disorders Program
P.O. Box 585 100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
McMaster University
Department of Pediatrics
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:16 Mar 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 09 Aug 2007
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 10 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 15 Mar 2009
CF - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Mar 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Feb 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 06 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 17 Jan 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 18 Apr 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 18 Apr 2019 Active
 
           Dr. Zainab Amer Samaan may practice medicine independently in psychiatry.