THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:06:12 AM
Quan, Kimmen
CPSO#:
87156
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: St. George's University School of Medici, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9711 Ext. 63123
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Kimmen Quan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 2 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KIMMEN QUAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Dec 2010 to 30 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 2015 |