THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 6:47:43 AM
Giuliani, Meredith Elana
CPSO#:
87141
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: St. George's Hospital Medical School, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
700 University Ave
7th Floor - Office 213
Radiation Medicine Program
Toronto ON M5G 1Z5
Phone: 4169462919
Fax: 4169464442
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MEREDITH ELANA GIULIANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIULIANI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 18 Sep 2007
AVP - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 19 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2012 |