skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 04/08/21 10:06:06 AM

Alnassar, Mu'taz Morshed Abdallah

CPSO#: 87135

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 May 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 02 May 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Jordan University of Sci. & Technology, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
1200 Main St W
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Alnassar and Takrouri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Alnassar ( CPSO# 87135 )
Dr. H. Takrouri ( CPSO# 92281 )

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100


Corporation Name: Heba Takrouri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Alnassar ( CPSO# 87135 )
Dr. H. Takrouri ( CPSO# 92281 )

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Radiology
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z6
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Jordan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:12 Dec 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 14 Sep 2007
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Radiology

University Of Toronto, 15 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Paediatric Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Paediatric Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Paediatric Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 May 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Dec 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Dec 2019 Active
             Dr.  Mu'taz  Morshed  Abdallah  Alnassar may practise medicine independently in
            pediatric radiology.