THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 20:27:28 PM
Marzouk, Sherief El-Sayed Mohamed
CPSO#:
87115
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Sep 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicin, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
399 Bathurst St
Toronto Western Hospital
Neuropsychiatry
7th Floor - MP
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: 416-603-5847
Fax: 416-603-5292
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHERIEF EL-SAYED MOHAMED MARZOUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARZOUK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 14 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 15 Jul 2009 to 14 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 15 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Dec 2013
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 2012 |