THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 14:29:19 PM
Amer, Ali
CPSO#:
87114
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Dec 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Dec 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Abdul-Mhsin, Ali Amir (used until: 05 Jun 2008 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Al-Nahrain University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay ON P1B 5A4
Phone: (705) 474-8600 Ext. 2939
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North Bay Regional Health Centre |
North Bay |
West Nipissing General Hospital |
Sturgeon Falls |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Pathology |
Effective:30 May 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALI AMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
AVP - General Pathology
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Dec 2015 |