THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 8:55:51 AM
Moretti, Felipe Mangoni
CPSO#:
87112
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Dec 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Dec 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: Fundacao Universidade De Caxias Do Sul, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa General Hospital
Division of Maternal Fetal Medicine
501 Smyth Rd
Room 8482
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 75506
Fax: (613) 737-8070
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:07 Mar 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 21 Sep 2007
PEAP - CF - Maternal-Fetal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Maternal-Fetal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Maternal-Fetal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Nov 2011
CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Sep 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Nov 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Nov 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Mar 2019 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2028 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Mar 2023 |
|
Active |