THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 9:15:04 AM
Walgama, Babarenda Guruge Shiromi Dilrukshi
CPSO#:
87109
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Feb 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Feb 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Sinhalese
Education: University of Colombo, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 124
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON N8X 3V6
Phone: (519) 946-0171
Fax: (519) 971-9120
Electoral District: 01
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Dec 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BABARENDA GURUGE SHIROMI DILRUKSHI WALGAMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALGAMA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Feb 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Feb 2010 |