skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/07/21 1:46:01 AM

Hack, Arshad

CPSO#: 87073

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Connecticut, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
501 Plains Rd E
Burlington ON  L7T 2E2
Phone: 9056357313 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Arshad Hack Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hack ( CPSO# 87073 )

Business Address:
Unit 208
2200 Fairview Street
Burlington ON  L7R 4H9
Phone Number: (905) 632-2542

Business Address:
501 Plains Rd E
Burlington ON  L7T 2E2
Phone Number: 9056357313

Business Address:
5200 Corporate Drive
Burlington ON  L7L 7G7
Phone Number: (905) 825-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ARSHAD HACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HACK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2009