THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
08/12/23 23:26:12 PM
Farahani, Mozhgan
CPSO#:
87049
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences Sc, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Halton Family Health Centre
3rd Floor
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON L7M 4Y1
Phone: (905) 662-3303
Fax: (905) 662-3304
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:22 May 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOZHGAN FARAHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARAHANI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Dec 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Dec 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |