THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 22:50:29 PM
Ott, Monica Sophia
CPSO#:
87037
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Jun 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
350 John St N
Arnprior & District Memorial Hospit
Emergency Department
Arnprior ON K7S 2P6
Phone: 613-623-3166
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Arnprior Regional Health |
Arnprior |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:19 Oct 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MONICA SOPHIA OTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OTT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 02 Jul 2007 to 14 Jul 2007
EL - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 15 Jul 2007 to 28 Jul 2007
EL - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Jul 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 2008 |