THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 15:19:56 PM
Szymczak, Peter Sebastian
CPSO#:
87028
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jan 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:150 Delhi Street, Guelph, ON, N1E 6K9
Date Received: 02 Jun 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:08 Dec 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 08 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 09 Dec 2010 to 08 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 09 Dec 2011 to 08 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Dec 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Jan 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jan 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2022 |