THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 1:47:16 AM
Yassin, Asma'a Abdul Rahman
CPSO#:
86987
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Mosul, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
11811 Tecumseh Rd E
Tecumseh walk-in clinic
Tecumseh ON N8N 4M7
Phone: 5199793355
Fax: 5199791429
Electoral District: 01
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Jul 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ASMA'A ABDUL RAHMAN YASSIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YASSIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 22 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2015 |