THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 19:18:00 PM
Fewster, Robert Frederick
CPSO#:
86976
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Dec 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Dec 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University College of Dublin, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
85 Norfolk Street
Guelph ON N1H 4J4
Phone: (519) 822-1871
Fax: (519) 822-1990
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Dec 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT FREDERICK FEWSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEWSTER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2007 to 23 Jan 2008
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Jan 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jan 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Dec 2009 |