skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 29/07/21 8:45:51 AM

Kisselgoff, Dimitry David

CPSO#: 86973

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Aug 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 28 Aug 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Kisselgoff, Dmitry David (used until: 20 Feb 2018 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian

Education:Chelyabinsk State Medical Academy, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional HSC
Department of Radiology
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6720
Fax: (807) 684-5853 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: D. Kisselgoff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kisselgoff ( CPSO# 86973 )
Dr. O. Kisselgoff ( CPSO# 99590 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional HSC
Department of Radiology
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6720


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Israel

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Manitouwadge General Hospital Manitouwadge
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:13 Jul 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 27 Aug 2007
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 28 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Nov 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 28 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jul 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jul 2018 Active
             Dr.  Dmitry  David Kisselgoff may practise medicine independently in diagnostic
            radiology.